Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/05/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/13/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/05/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/11/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/13/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew