There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Congressional Science Competition Resolution of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Establishing the Congressional Science Competition for conducting academic competitions in the sciences among high school students in Congressional districts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/22/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/22/2004Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
04/22/2004Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E634-635)
04/22/2004Introduced in House

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/22/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/04/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/04/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/06/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/06/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/11/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/11/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/11/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/20/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/21/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration04/22/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.604.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.604. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/22/2004)

Congressional Science Competition Resolution of 2004 - Establishes the Congressional Science Competition under which an academic competition in the sciences shall be held each year among high school students in congressional districts. Requires the Competition to: (1) be carried out with such regulations as may be prescribed by the Committee on House Administration; and (2) be based on a topic or theme which reflects a scientific issue of importance to Congress and which is designated by the Committee on Science.