Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/22/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/04/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/04/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/06/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/06/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/11/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/11/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/11/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/20/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/08/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/21/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2004