Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/27/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/27/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/28/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/04/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/04/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/04/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/05/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/05/2004