Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/02/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/09/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/09/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/09/2004