Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/09/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/14/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/17/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/18/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/18/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/18/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/18/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/18/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/18/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/18/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/18/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/18/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/18/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/21/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/21/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/21/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/21/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/21/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/21/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/21/2004
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/21/2004
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/21/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/22/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/22/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/22/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/22/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/22/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/23/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/23/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/23/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/24/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/06/2004