Text: H.Res.667 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (09/13/2004)

 
[Congressional Bills 108th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 667 Engrossed in House (EH)]


                 In the House of Representatives, U.S.,

                                                    September 13, 2004.
Whereas according to the April 1, 2004, report by the Department of State 
        entitled U.S.-Hong Kong Policy Act Report, ``The United States has 
        strong interests in the protection of human rights and the promotion of 
        democratic institutions throughout the world. The Hong Kong people share 
        many values and interests with Americans and have worked to make Hong 
        Kong a model of what can be achieved in a society based on the rule of 
        law and respect for civil liberties'';
Whereas according to section 103(3) of the United States-Hong Kong Policy Act of 
        1992 (22 U.S.C. 5713(3)), ``The United States should continue to treat 
        Hong Kong as a territory which is fully autonomous from the United 
        Kingdom and, after June 30, 1997, should treat Hong Kong as a territory 
        which is fully autonomous from the People's Republic of China with 
        respect to economic and trade matters.'';
Whereas the People's Republic of China has frustrated the gradual and orderly 
        process toward universal suffrage and the democratic election of the 
        legislature and chief executive in Hong Kong as envisioned by the Basic 
        Law of the Hong Kong SAR; and
Whereas on April 6, 2004, the Standing Committee of the National People's 
        Congress of the People's Republic of China declared itself, as opposed 
        to the people of Hong Kong, the final arbiter of democratic reform and, 
        on April 26, 2004, declared that universal suffrage would not apply to 
        the election of the third Chief Executive in 2007 or to the election of 
        all members of the fourth Legislative Council in 2008: Now, therefore, 
        be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) declares that the people of Hong Kong should be free to 
        determine the pace and scope of constitutional developments; and
            (2) calls upon the President of the United States to--
                    (A) call upon the People's Republic of China, the National 
                People's Congress, and any groups appointed by the Government of 
                the People's Republic of China to guarantee that all revisions 
                of Hong Kong law reflect the wishes of the people of Hong Kong 
                as expressed through a fully democratically elected legislature 
                and chief executive;
                    (B) declare that the continued lack of a fully 
                democratically elected legislature in Hong Kong is contrary to 
                the vision of democracy set forth in the Agreement between the 
                Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern 
                Ireland and the Government of the People's Republic of China on 
                the Question of Hong Kong, done at Beijing on December 19, 1984 
                (the Sino-British Joint Declaration of 1984); and
                    (C) call upon the Government of the People's Republic of 
                China to honor its treaty obligations under the Sino-British 
                Joint Declaration of 1984.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.