Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/22/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/22/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/23/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/23/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/23/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/24/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/24/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/25/2004
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/25/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/25/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 06/25/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 06/25/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/25/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/25/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/25/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/25/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/25/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/25/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/25/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/25/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/06/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/08/2004