Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/23/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/06/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/06/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/06/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/06/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/06/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/06/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/06/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/06/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/06/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/06/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/06/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/06/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/06/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/06/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/08/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/08/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/08/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/12/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/12/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/12/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/12/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/14/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/14/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/14/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/14/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/14/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/14/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/14/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/14/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/14/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/14/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/14/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/14/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/14/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/14/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/15/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/15/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/15/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/15/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/20/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/20/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/20/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/21/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/21/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/21/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/21/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/21/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/21/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/21/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/21/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/22/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/22/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/22/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/13/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/13/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/13/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/14/2004