Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/25/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/06/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/12/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/12/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/12/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/12/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/12/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/12/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/14/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/14/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/14/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/14/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/14/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/14/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/14/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/14/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/14/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/14/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/14/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/14/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/14/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/14/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/14/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/15/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/15/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/15/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/19/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/20/2004