Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 09/08/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 09/08/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/22/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/22/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/22/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/22/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/22/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/22/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/22/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/22/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/23/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/23/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/23/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/23/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/23/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/28/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/06/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/06/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/16/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/16/2004