Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/21/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 09/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/22/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/28/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/28/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/28/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/28/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/28/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/28/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/28/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/28/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/28/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/28/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/28/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/28/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/28/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/28/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/28/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/28/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/29/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/29/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/30/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/30/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/04/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/04/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/04/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/04/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/04/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/06/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/06/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/06/2004