Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/08/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/25/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/09/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 08/01/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/25/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/09/2003