Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/09/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/09/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 05/09/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/15/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/12/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/10/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/14/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/30/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/04/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/20/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/27/2004