There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Popular Titles

FCC Media Ownership bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Preservation of Localism, Program Diversity, and Competition in Television Broadcast Service Act of 2003

Short Titles as Introduced

Preservation of Localism, Program Diversity, and Competition in Television Broadcast Service Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Communications Act of 1934 to preserve localism, to foster and promote the diversity of television programming, to foster and promote competition, and to prevent excessive concentration of ownership of the nation's television broadcast stations.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/03/2003Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with an amendment. With written report No. 108-141. Additional views filed.
05/13/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
09/16/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S11505)
Action By: Senate
09/03/2003Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 270.
Action By: Senate
09/03/2003Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with an amendment. With written report No. 108-141. Additional views filed.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
06/19/2003Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
05/13/2003Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6082-6083)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/14/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/14/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/19/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/19/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/21/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/22/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/23/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/02/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/03/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/03/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/03/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/03/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/05/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/05/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/05/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/10/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/10/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/10/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/10/2003
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/12/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/20/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/20/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/23/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/24/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/25/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/26/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/27/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/09/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/10/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/14/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/14/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/15/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/16/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/24/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/28/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/02/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/03/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/05/2003
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/15/2003 07/29/2003 --
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/10/2003 07/16/2003 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/13/2003 Referred to
06/19/2003 Markup by
09/03/2003 Reported by S. Rept. 108-141

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1046. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/03/2003)

Preservation of Localism, Program Diversity, and Competition in Television Broadcast Service Act of 2003 - (Sec. 3) Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to prohibit the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) from permitting any license for a commercial television broadcast station to be granted, transferred, or assigned to any party if such action would result in that party owning, operating, controlling, or having a cognizable interest in stations which have an aggregate national audience reach exceeding 35 percent. Requires any party currently having licenses in excess of such limit to divest as necessary to comply with such limit within one year.

(Sec. 4) Prohibits any party, after one year after the enactment of this Act, from exceeding the caps on local radio ownership established by the FCC in its media ownership proceeding.

(Sec. 5) Amends the Telecommunications Act of 1996 to require the FCC: (1) to biennially review its broadcast media ownership rules (current law) and to change, repeal, or retain such rules, as appropriate; and (2) before changing, repealing, or retaining a rule, to hold at least five public hearings in different areas of the United States.

(Sec. 7) Declares null and void the cross-media limits rule adopted by the FCC on June 2, 2003. Reinstates the previous rules pertaining to broadcast-newspaper and radio-television cross-ownership, to be applied retroactively to such date.

Allows the public utility commission of a State of a small (rural) market with a Designated Market Area of 150 or higher to recommend, on a case-by-case basis, that the FCC grant a waiver of its cross-ownership rules if the public utility commission finds that the proposed transaction for which the waiver is required will enhance local news and information, promote the financial stability of a newspaper, radio station, or television station, or otherwise promote the public interest. Authorizes the FCC to approve such recommendation within 60 days unless there is compelling evidence that the related transaction would be contrary to the public interest.