Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/13/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/14/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/14/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/19/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/19/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/21/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/22/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/23/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/02/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/03/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/03/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/03/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/03/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/05/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/05/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/05/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/05/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/10/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/10/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/10/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/10/2003
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 06/12/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/20/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/20/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/23/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/24/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/25/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/26/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/27/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/09/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/10/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/14/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/14/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/15/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/16/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/24/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/28/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/02/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/03/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/05/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew