Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/21/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/21/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/21/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/10/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 06/11/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/17/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/17/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/18/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/23/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/25/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/25/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/17/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/09/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/09/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/09/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/04/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/09/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/07/2004