Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/21/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/09/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/11/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/10/2004