Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/02/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/05/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/17/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/24/2003