Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/18/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/26/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/11/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/29/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/29/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 04/19/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/26/2004