Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/23/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/23/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/23/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/23/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/23/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/23/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/23/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/02/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/20/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 02/12/2004