Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/22/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/19/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/19/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/23/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/23/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/24/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/25/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/26/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/15/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/30/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/03/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/17/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/24/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/27/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/01/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/02/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/24/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/30/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/05/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/19/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/14/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/16/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/21/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/23/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/24/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/25/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/25/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/06/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/16/2004