Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/27/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-373.
10/27/2004 Signed by President.
10/15/2004 Presented to President.
10/07/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 31 (Roll no. 507).(text: CR H8344-8348)
10/06/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/01/2004 Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-382. Additional views filed.
05/22/2003 Introduced in Senate