Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/04/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/04/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/05/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/05/2003
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/05/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/09/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/09/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/09/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/09/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/09/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/09/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/10/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/10/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/10/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/10/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/10/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/10/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/10/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/10/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/10/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/10/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/11/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/11/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/11/2003