Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/17/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/17/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/17/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/19/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/30/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/23/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 01/21/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/20/2004