Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/05/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 06/05/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/10/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/10/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/12/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/12/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/18/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/18/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/25/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/02/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/09/2003