Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 06/12/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 06/12/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/12/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/12/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/12/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 06/12/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/12/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/12/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/13/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/16/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/23/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/02/2004