Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/13/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/11/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/11/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/11/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/11/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/11/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/11/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 11/11/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/11/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 11/11/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/11/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/11/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/11/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/11/2003
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/11/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/11/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/11/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/11/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/11/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/11/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/11/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 11/11/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/11/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/11/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/11/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/11/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/11/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/11/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/11/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/11/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/11/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/11/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/11/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/11/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/11/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/11/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/11/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/11/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 11/18/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/18/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/18/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/18/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 11/19/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/19/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/19/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/19/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 11/20/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 11/20/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 11/20/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/20/2003