Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/18/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 06/18/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/18/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/29/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/19/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 02/11/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/11/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 02/24/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/07/2004