Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/25/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/25/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/26/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/26/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/16/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/17/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/21/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/28/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/29/2003
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/30/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/30/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 08/01/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/03/2003
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/03/2003