Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/26/2003
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/26/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/26/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/15/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/31/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/04/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/25/2004