Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/26/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/22/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/16/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/24/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/14/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/17/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/21/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/31/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/03/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/12/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 11/25/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/31/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/05/2004