There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. and Coretta Scott King Congressional Gold Medal bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the President to award a gold medal on behalf of the Congress to Reverend Doctor Martin Luther King , Jr. (posthumously) and his widow Coretta Scott King in recognition of their contributions to the Nation on behalf of the civil rights movement.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/25/2004Became Public Law No: 108-368. (TXT | PDF)
10/25/2004Signed by President.
10/13/2004Presented to President.
10/08/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9024-9025)
10/08/2004Committee on Financial Services discharged.
09/09/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S9044)
09/09/2004Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9043-9044)
06/27/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/25/2004Became Public Law No: 108-368. (TXT | PDF)
10/25/2004Signed by President.
10/13/2004SenatePresented to President.
10/08/2004-10:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/08/2004-10:55pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9024-9025)
10/08/2004-10:54pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9024-9025)
10/08/2004-10:54pmHouseMr. LaTourette asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/08/2004HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
10/07/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
09/13/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
09/13/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/13/2004-12:30pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/09/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9044)
09/09/2004SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9043-9044)
06/27/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/07/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/07/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/07/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/07/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/07/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/08/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/08/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/09/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/09/2003
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/10/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/10/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/21/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/22/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/27/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/03/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/03/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/05/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/05/2004
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/05/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/05/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/05/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 05/11/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/13/2004
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/13/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 05/17/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/19/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/19/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/19/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/19/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/20/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/20/2004
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/01/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/02/2004
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/14/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 06/16/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/16/2004
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/16/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/18/2004
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/21/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/21/2004
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/06/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/20/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/21/2004
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/21/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/21/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/21/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/21/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/09/2004
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/09/2004
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/27/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs06/27/2003 Referred to
09/09/2004 Discharged from
House Financial Services09/13/2004 Referred to
10/08/2004 Discharged from
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology10/07/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1368. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-368 (10/25/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the President to present, on behalf of Congress, a gold medal to Reverend Doctor Martin Luther King, Jr. (posthumously) and his widow Coretta Scott King in recognition of their service to the Nation.