Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/27/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 07/28/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/31/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/14/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/15/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/22/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/08/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/01/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/20/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/01/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/06/2004