Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/15/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/16/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/17/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/21/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/22/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/23/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/24/2003
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/25/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 08/01/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/02/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/15/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/22/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/23/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 10/27/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/28/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/28/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/29/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 10/30/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 11/05/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/07/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/11/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/20/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/20/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/29/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 04/05/2004
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/07/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/07/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/07/2004
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/08/2004
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/19/2004
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/19/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/19/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/26/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/27/2004
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/29/2004
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/20/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/02/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/03/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/07/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/07/2004
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/09/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 06/09/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/16/2004
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/06/2004
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/14/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 07/19/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/19/2004
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/19/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/08/2004
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/13/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/13/2004
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/13/2004
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/14/2004
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/20/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/20/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/20/2004
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/20/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/21/2004
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 09/21/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 09/22/2004
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/23/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/27/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/28/2004
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/28/2004
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/28/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/28/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/28/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/28/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/29/2004
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/30/2004
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/01/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/05/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/05/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/06/2004
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/07/2004