Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/14/2003
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 07/14/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/14/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 07/14/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/14/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/14/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/14/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 08/01/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/24/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/20/2004
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 01/20/2004
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/27/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/22/2004
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/24/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/07/2004