There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ocean and Coastal Observation Systems Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Ocean and Coastal Observation Systems Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Ocean Observation and Coastal Systems Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to develop a system that provides for ocean and coastal observations, to implement a research and development program to enhance security at United States ports, to implement a data and information system required by all components of an integrated ocean observing system and related research, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/31/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13735-13739; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S13735-13738)
10/23/2003Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-171.
07/14/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
01/05/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Projection Forces.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
01/05/2004HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
11/13/2003HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Commerce.
11/13/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Resources
11/12/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
Action By: Committee on Science
11/12/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Research.
Action By: Committee on Science
11/12/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards.
Action By: Committee on Science
11/04/2003HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
11/04/2003HouseReferred to House Armed Services
11/04/2003HouseReferred to House Science
11/04/2003HouseReferred to House Resources
11/04/2003HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Armed Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/04/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/04/2003-12:30pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/31/2003SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13735-13739; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S13735-13738)
10/23/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
10/23/2003SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 108-171.
07/17/2003SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/14/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S9332-9334)
07/14/2003SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S9332)

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/14/2003 Referred to
07/17/2003 Markup by
10/23/2003 Reported by S. Rept. 108-171
House Resources11/04/2003 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife, and Oceans11/13/2003 Referred to
House Science11/04/2003 Referred to
House Science Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards11/12/2003 Referred to
House Science Subcommittee on Research11/12/2003 Referred to
House Science Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics11/12/2003 Referred to
House Armed Services11/04/2003 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Projection Forces01/05/2004 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/04/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1400.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1400. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/31/2003)

Ocean and Coastal Observation Systems Act - (Sec. 3) Directs the President, through the National Ocean Research Leadership Council (NORLC), to establish and maintain a national integrated ocean and coastal observing system (system) of marine monitoring, data communication and management, data analysis, and research to provide data and information for rapid and timely detection and prediction of changes occurring in the marine environment that impact the Nation's social, economic, and ecological systems.

Establishes an Interagency Planning Office (IPO) within NORLC with various functions. Directs the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to operate and maintain a Joint Operations Center (JOC) which reports to NORLC and which has specified authority. Directs NOAA, with respect to JOC operations, to consult with specified officers of departments and agencies represented on the NORLC.

Sets forth system elements and requires subsystem linkages. Requires the system to integrate the capabilities of the Coast Services Center and the National Coastal Data Development Center of NOAA, and other appropriate centers. Requires the research and development program for the system to be conducted under the National Oceanographic Partnership Program (NOPP) and consist of specified elements.

Directs NOAA Administrator, through JOC, to work with representatives of entities in each region that provide ocean data and information to users to form regional associations to develop and operate observing systems in the coastal regions extending to the seaward boundary of the U.S. Exclusive Economic Zone, including the Great Lakes. Directs NOAA, through IPO, to initiate pilot projects, including infrastructure capital projects, through NOPP.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes the departments and agencies represented on the NORLC to participate in interagency financing, allowing them to share, transfer, receive, and spend funds appropriated to other members of the NORLC to carry out projects or activities under this Act or under the NOPP.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes appropriations for FY 2004 through 2008, to develop and implement the system, to the following departments and agencies represented on the NORLC: (1) NOAA; (2) the National Science Foundation; (3) the National Aeronautics and Space Administration; (4) the U.S. Coast Guard; (5) the Office of Naval Research; (6) the Office of the Oceanographer of the Navy; and (7) other Federal agencies engaged in ocean and coastal-related activities. Requires a reservation of at least 51 percent of the NOAA funds for grants to develop and implement regional coastal observing systems. Authorizes NOAA to make available a specified amount in FY 2004 to demonstrate the capabilities of shore-based high-frequency surface wave radar.