Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 07/15/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/20/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/11/2004
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/24/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/06/2004
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/10/2004
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 05/21/2004
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/01/2004
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/02/2004
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/03/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/08/2004
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/08/2004
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/09/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/15/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/15/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/15/2004
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/16/2004
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/09/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/09/2004
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/12/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/19/2004