Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/06/2004
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/06/2004
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/06/2004
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/06/2004
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/06/2004
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/06/2004
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 05/06/2004
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/01/2004
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/01/2004
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/03/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/08/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/08/2004
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/08/2004
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/22/2004
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/14/2004
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/21/2004
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/21/2004
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 09/22/2004
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/06/2004