There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Prison Rape Elimination Act of 2003

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Prison Rape Elimination Act of 2003

Short Titles as Introduced

Prison Rape Elimination Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the analysis of the incidence and effects of prison rape in Federal, State, and local institutions and to provide information, resources, recommendations, and funding to protect individuals from prison rape.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
09/04/2003Became Public Law No: 108-79. (TXT | PDF)
09/04/2003Signed by President.
09/02/2003Presented to President.
07/25/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H7766-7771)
07/21/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9659-9664; text as passed Senate: CR S9659-9664)
07/21/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/04/2003Became Public Law No: 108-79. (TXT | PDF)
09/04/2003Signed by President.
09/02/2003SenatePresented to President.
07/25/2003-6:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2003-6:40pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7766-7771)
07/25/2003-6:39pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7764-7771)
07/25/2003-6:39pmHouseMr. Sensenbrenner asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
07/22/2003-10:49pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/22/2003-9:02amHouseReceived in the House.
07/22/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/21/2003SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9659-9664; text as passed Senate: CR S9659-9664)

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/21/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/21/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/21/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 07/21/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/29/2003 Legislative interest
12/01/2003 Legislative interest
12/15/2003 Legislative interest

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1435. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-79 (09/04/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Prison Rape Elimination Act of 2003 - (Sec. 4) Directs the Bureau of Justice Statistics to carry out, annually, a comprehensive statistical review and analysis of the incidence and effects of prison rape. Requires: (1) the review and analysis to be based on a sample of not less than ten percent of all Federal, State, and county prisons, and a representative sample of municipal prisons, that includes at least one prison from each State; and (2) Federal, State, or local officials or facility administrators that receive a request from the Bureau to participate in the national survey and provide access to any inmates under their legal custody.

Establishes within the Department of Justice the Review Panel on Prison Rape to carry out, for each calendar year, public hearings concerning the operation of the three prisons with the highest incidence of prison rape and the two prisons with the lowest incidence in each category of facilities identified. Declares that the purpose of these hearings shall be to collect evidence to aid in the identification of common characteristics of: (1) victims and perpetrators of prison rape; (2) prisons and prison systems with a high incidence of prison rape; and and (3) prisons and prison systems that appear to have been successful in deterring prison rape.

Requires the Attorney General to submit an annual report to Congress and the Secretary of Health and Human Services on Bureau and Panel activities regarding prison rape. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2004 through 2010.

(Sec. 5) Establishes within the National Institute of Corrections (NIC) a national clearinghouse for the provision of information, assistance, and training to Federal, State, and local authorities for the prevention, investigation, and punishment of prison rape.

(Sec. 6) Directs the Attorney General to make grants to to assist States in ensuring that budgetary circumstances do not compromise efforts to protect inmates and to safeguard the communities to which inmates return. Authorizes appropriations for FY 2004 through 2010, with a limitation.

(Sec. 7) Establishes the National Prison Rape Reduction Commission to: (1) study the impact of prison rape on Federal, State, and local governments and on communities and social institutions; and (2) report recommended national standards for enhancing the detection, prevention, reduction, and punishment of prison rape.

(Sec. 8) Directs the Attorney General, within one year after receiving such report, to publish a final rule adopting national standards. Provides for a five percent reduction of any amount of grant funds for prisons that a State would otherwise receive for a fiscal year, unless the chief executive of the State submits to the Attorney General: (1) a certification that the State has adopted, and is in full compliance with, the national standards; or (2) an assurance that not less than five percent of such amount shall be used only to enable the State to adopt and achieve full compliance with such standards, so as to ensure that such certification may be submitted in future years. Requires the Attorney General to publish an annual report listing each grantee that is not in compliance with the standards.

(Sec. 9) Prohibits the receipt of Federal grants by penal facility accredication organizations that fail to adopt accreditation standards for the detection, prevention, reduction, and punishment of prison rape.