Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/29/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/31/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/04/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/04/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/04/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/04/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/04/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 01/26/2004
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/23/2004
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/27/2004