Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/06/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/10/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/24/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/27/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/05/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/06/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 03/11/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/31/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/31/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/31/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/24/2003