Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/13/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 01/13/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 01/15/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/15/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 01/16/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 01/30/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/04/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/24/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/24/2003