Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/03/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/24/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 10/03/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/07/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/25/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 02/27/2004
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/15/2004