Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/02/2003
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 09/04/2003
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/08/2003
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 09/08/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/08/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/08/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/08/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/08/2003
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/08/2003
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/08/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/08/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/08/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/08/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/10/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/10/2003
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/10/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/10/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/10/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/11/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/11/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/11/2003
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/17/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/23/2003
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/23/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/23/2003
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/29/2003
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/29/2003
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/29/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/30/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/30/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/30/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/01/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/03/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 10/03/2003
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/14/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/14/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/14/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/14/2003
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/16/2003
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/16/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 10/17/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/17/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/17/2003
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/17/2003
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/17/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/17/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/17/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/17/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 10/20/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/20/2003
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/20/2003
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/20/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/20/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/20/2003
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/20/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/22/2003
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/28/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/06/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/12/2003
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/12/2003