Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/01/2003
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 08/01/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/01/2003
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 08/01/2003
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/01/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/01/2003
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/01/2003
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 08/01/2003
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/02/2003
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/04/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/04/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/04/2003
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/04/2003
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/04/2003
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/04/2003
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/04/2003
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/04/2003
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/09/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/09/2003
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/09/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/17/2003
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/17/2003
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/24/2003
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/29/2003
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/29/2003
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/29/2003
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 10/01/2003
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/01/2003
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/14/2003
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/15/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/15/2003
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/27/2003
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/04/2003
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 11/11/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/22/2004
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/22/2004
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/2004
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/20/2004
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/27/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/03/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew