Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/31/2003
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/30/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/30/2003
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/21/2003
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/22/2003
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 11/22/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/25/2004
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/06/2004
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/20/2004
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/20/2004
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 04/20/2004
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/20/2004
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/20/2004
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/20/2004