Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 08/01/2003
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 08/01/2003
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/11/2003
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/15/2003
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/18/2003
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/23/2003
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/24/2003
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 10/02/2003
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 10/15/2003
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/17/2003
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/17/2003
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/22/2003
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/29/2003
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 11/24/2003
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/19/2004
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 04/21/2004
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/03/2004
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/15/2004
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/16/2004
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/17/2004
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/09/2004
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/16/2004
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/17/2004