Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/23/2003
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/25/2003
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/26/2003
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/29/2003
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/30/2003
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/30/2003
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/30/2003
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 10/02/2003
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/20/2003
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/21/2003
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 02/10/2004