There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to preserve existing judgeships on the Superior Court of the District of Columbia.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/20/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S15310; text as passed Senate: CR S15310)
11/18/2003Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. With written report No. 108-200.
08/01/2003Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
11/21/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
11/21/2003-11:15amHouseReceived in the House.
11/21/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S15310; text as passed Senate: CR S15310)
11/18/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399.
11/18/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. With written report No. 108-200.
10/22/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
08/01/2003SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
08/01/2003SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10912)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 08/01/2003
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 08/01/2003

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs08/01/2003 Referred to
10/22/2003 Markup by
11/18/2003 Reported by S. Rept. 108-200
House Government Reform11/21/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1561.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1561. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (11/20/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the District of Columbia Code to increase from 58 to 61 the number of associate judges on the Superior Court of the District of Columbia.